Global Patent Index - EP 1044151 A1

EP 1044151 A1 2000-10-18 - DEVICE FOR REMOVING PLATE-LIKE OBJECTS

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR REMOVING PLATE-LIKE OBJECTS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM ENTNEHMEN VON PLATTENFÖRMIGEN GEGENSTÄNDEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR PRELEVER DES OBJETS SOUS FORME DE PLAQUES

Publication

EP 1044151 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98962125 A

Priority

  • AT 9800319 W
  • AT 220297 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9935068A1] The invention relates to a device for unstacking plates (2) contained in a horizontal magazine (1), especially lead plates for batteries and accumulators, comprising a removing gripper (10) having at least one suction head (23). The removing gripper (10) takes the frontmost plate (2) situated in the removing position (8), pulls it away from the stack in the magazine (1) and pivots it in a pivoting movement about a horizontal axis located in the lower area of the plate (2) towards a conveyor (11) arranged next to the magazine (1). The lower area of the plate (2) moves against the loading end of the conveyor (11) so that the plate (2) is pivoted further. As soon as the plate (2) is inclined at an angle of approximately 45 DEG to the vertical, the removing gripper (10) releases the plate (2), which falls by virtue of its own weight and aided by the movement of the conveyor (11) onto same and is taken away by it. Devices (12) for brushing the lugs of lead plates may be assigned to the conveyor (11). The invention provides for a device (18) on the delivery end of the conveyor (11) with which the plates (2) can be moved on to a second conveyor (30) in a precisely aligned manner.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 3/08; B65H 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65G 59/12 (2006.01); B65G 47/91 (2006.01); B65H 1/02 (2006.01); B65H 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 3/0808 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9935068A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9935068 A1 19990715; AT 212944 T 20020215; AT 405824 B 19991125; AT A220297 A 19990415; CN 1078168 C 20020123; CN 1268934 A 20001004; DE 59803046 D1 20020321; EP 1044151 A1 20001018; EP 1044151 B1 20020206; ES 2151471 T1 20010101; ES 2151471 T3 20021001; JP 2002500147 A 20020108

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051222

2004-12-22 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041222

2004-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20021223

2003-12-22 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20031222

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-10-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-09-01 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030901

2003-08-13 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20021222

2003-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030701

2003-01-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021107

2002-12-23 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021223

2002-12-22 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021222

2002-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2151471 T3

2002-07-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-05-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020418

2002-03-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59803046 20020321

2002-02-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2002-02-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 212944 T 20020215

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010308

2001-01-01 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2151471 T1

2000-11-24 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

2000-11-22 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991216

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT