Global patent index - EP 1044155 A1

EP 1044155 A1 2000-10-18 - DEVICE FOR CHANGING THE POSITION OF OBJECTS CONVEYED IN AN OVERLAPPING STREAM

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR CHANGING THE POSITION OF OBJECTS CONVEYED IN AN OVERLAPPING STREAM

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERÄNDERN DER LAGE VON IN EINEM SCHUPPENSTROM GEFÖRDERTEN GEGENSTÄNDEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR MODIFIER LA POSITION D'ARTICLES ACHEMINES DANS UN COURANT A RECOUVREMENT

Publication

EP 1044155 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98960985 A

Priority

  • CH 9800561 W
  • CH 298697 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9935072A1] The invention relates to a position-changing device (16) comprising displacement means (18) moved along a motion path (24) by means of a drive (22). The displacement means are driven at a speed (v) which corresponds at least approximately to the conveying speed (v2) of the second conveyor (14) to which the displacement means (18) convey the objects (28) at a set distance (A2). The objects arrive on the first belt conveyor (12) in an overlapping arrangement (S1) and are moved by said belt conveyor to the working area of the position-changing device (16).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 29/66; B65H 5/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 5/24 (2006.01); B65H 29/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/669 (2013.01); B65H 5/24 (2013.01); B65H 29/6654 (2013.01); B65H 2301/44712 (2013.01); B65H 2301/44732 (2013.01); B65H 2511/22 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B65H 2301/44712 + B65H 2220/01
  2. B65H 2301/44732 + B65H 2220/02

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9935072A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9935072 A1 19990715; AT 217292 T 20020515; AU 1658599 A 19990726; AU 740546 B2 20011108; CA 2310809 A1 19990715; CA 2310809 C 20070403; DE 59804099 D1 20020613; DK 1044155 T3 20020708; EP 1044155 A1 20001018; EP 1044155 B1 20020508; ES 2173655 T3 20021016; JP 2002500149 A 20020108; RU 2194002 C2 20021210; US 6554125 B1 20030429

INPADOC legal status

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160302

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151210

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-01-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-07-21 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

- Effective date: 20131231

2013-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121219

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101230

2012-02-06 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20120206

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101229

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101229

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110103

2011-09-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110831

2011-08-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101229

2011-08-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20101229

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100108

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091218

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091223

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091222

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091215

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-09-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20060701

2006-07-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060701

2005-02-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: FERAG AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2004-12-10 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041210

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *FERAG A.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20021231

2003-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030211

2002-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-12-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021229

2002-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2173655

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-10-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-08-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020720

2002-08-08 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020808

2002-07-08 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2002-06-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59804099

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-06-13

2002-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2002-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-05-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2002-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 217292

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-05-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010704

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000613

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE