Global Patent Index - EP 1044173 A1

EP 1044173 A1 2000-10-18 - METHOD OF MAKING LARGE SCALE OPTICAL FIBER PREFORMS WITH IMPROVED PROPERTIES

Title (en)

METHOD OF MAKING LARGE SCALE OPTICAL FIBER PREFORMS WITH IMPROVED PROPERTIES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER VORFORM GROSSEN MASSSTABS FÜR OPTISCHE FASERN MIT VERBESSERTEN EIGENSCHAFTEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FABRICATION A GRANDE ECHELLE DE PREFORMES DE FIBRES OPTIQUES DOTEES DE CARACTERISTIQUES AMELIOREES

Publication

EP 1044173 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98966067 A

Priority

  • US 9827418 W
  • US 99730897 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9932413A1] Core soot material (62) is deposited via a stream (55) onto a target (34). At least one additional layer (64) is deposited on the core material (62). A cladding layer (65) is deposited on the previous layer (64). Then this item is dehydrated, sintered and formed into a plurality of fibers.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C03B 37/014; C03B 37/018

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C03B 37/014 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C03B 37/0142 (2013.01); C03B 37/01446 (2013.01); C03B 37/01466 (2013.01); C03B 2201/02 (2013.01); C03B 2201/12 (2013.01); C03B 2201/31 (2013.01); C03B 2203/22 (2013.01); C03B 2207/06 (2013.01); C03B 2207/12 (2013.01); C03B 2207/54 (2013.01); C03B 2207/64 (2013.01); C03B 2207/87 (2013.01); Y02P 40/57 (2015.11)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9932413 A1 19990701; EP 1044173 A1 20001018; EP 1044173 A4 20050309

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130702

2009-10-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090910

2005-03-09 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20050121

2000-11-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WU, FENGQING

2000-11-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HUERTA, AURELIA

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000704

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB