Global Patent Index - EP 1044180 A1

EP 1044180 A1 2000-10-18 - Use of nitro compounds

Title (en)

Use of nitro compounds

Title (de)

Verwendung von Nitroverbindungen

Title (fr)

Utilisation de composés nitrés

Publication

EP 1044180 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99903602 A

Priority

  • DE 19800106 A
  • EP 9900012 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19900110A1] A propellent-type composition, comprising a nitroamine and a desensitizing binder, also contains a nitro compound.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C06B 25/34; C06D 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C06B 25/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C06B 25/34 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19900110 A1 19990708; EP 1044180 A1 20001018; EP 1044180 B1 20180411; WO 9935108 A1 19990715

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-03 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 59915475

2018-05-02 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2018-04-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 987850 T

- Effective date: 20180415

2018-04-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2018-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2018-04-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2017-10-25 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20170925

2004-08-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DYNAMIT NOBEL DEFENCE GMBH

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010525

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000807

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE