Global Patent Index - EP 1044255 A1

EP 1044255 A1 2000-10-18 - SHAPED BODIES OF DISHWASHING DETERGENT WITH BLEACH ACTIVATORS

Title (en)

SHAPED BODIES OF DISHWASHING DETERGENT WITH BLEACH ACTIVATORS

Title (de)

GESCHIRRSPÜLMITTELFORMKÖRPER MIT BLEICHAKTIVATOREN

Title (fr)

AGENTS POUR LAVER LA VAISSELLE SOUS FORME DE CORPS MOULES CONTENANT DES ACTIVATEURS DE BLANCHIMENT

Publication

EP 1044255 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98965662 A

Priority

  • CA 2298847 A
  • DE 19758180 A
  • EP 9807151 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19758180A1] The invention relates to shaped bodies containing builder substances, alkali supports, bleaching agents, enzymes and tensides. The inventive high-performance shaped bodies are also very stable in storage and have a pleasant fragrance and a defined solubility profile. According to the invention, one area of the shaped body representing no more than 40 vol. % thereof contains more than 80 wt. % of the total quantity of an active substance (I) contained in the shaped body with a constituent from the group of bleach activators.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 17/00; C11D 3/39

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 17/06 (2006.01); C11D 3/06 (2006.01); C11D 3/08 (2006.01); C11D 3/10 (2006.01); C11D 3/20 (2006.01); C11D 3/28 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01); C11D 3/382 (2006.01); C11D 3/386 (2006.01); C11D 3/39 (2006.01); C11D 3/395 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01); C11D 1/66 (2006.01); C11D 1/72 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 17/0073 (2013.01); C11D 3/06 (2013.01); C11D 3/08 (2013.01); C11D 3/10 (2013.01); C11D 3/28 (2013.01); C11D 3/3907 (2013.01); C11D 17/0078 (2013.01); C11D 17/0091 (2013.01); C11D 1/662 (2013.01); C11D 1/72 (2013.01); C11D 3/3915 (2013.01); C11D 3/3917 (2013.01); C11D 3/3932 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9935229A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19758180 A1 19990701; CA 2298847 A1 20000513; CZ 20002489 A3 20011114; EP 1044255 A1 20001018; HU 0004888 A2 20010528; JP 2002500265 A 20020108; PL 341382 A1 20010409; SK 9972000 A3 20001211; WO 9935229 A1 19990715

INPADOC legal status


2012-10-10 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20120603

2012-06-03 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2008-06-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HENKEL AG & CO. KGAA

2003-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030417

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000621

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL