Global Patent Index - EP 1044265 A1

EP 1044265 A1 2000-10-18 - DNA ENCODING A GABA BR2 POLYPEPTIDE AND USES THEREOF

Title (en)

DNA ENCODING A GABA BR2 POLYPEPTIDE AND USES THEREOF

Title (de)

DNA, DIE FÜR EIN GABA BR2 POLYPEPTID KODIERT UND DEREN VERWENDUNGEN

Title (fr)

ADN CODANT UN POLYPEPTIDE GABA BR2 ET SES UTILISATIONS

Publication

EP 1044265 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99943972 A

Priority

  • US 9919651 W
  • US 14176098 A
  • US 9822033 W
  • US 18666498 A
  • US 21175598 A

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/10; C07K 14/705; C12N 5/10; C12N 15/12; C12Q 1/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/705 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/12 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

AU 5695899 A 20000321; EP 1044265 A1 20001018; EP 1044265 A4 20021029

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050301

2003-11-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030919

2002-12-11 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20021029

2002-10-29 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

2002-10-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000808

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE