Global Patent Index - EP 1044289 A2

EP 1044289 A2 2000-10-18 - PLASMA BORONIZING

Title (en)

PLASMA BORONIZING

Title (de)

PLASMABORIERUNG

Title (fr)

BORURATION AU PLASMA

Publication

EP 1044289 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98965249 A

Priority

  • DE 19755595 A
  • EP 9808079 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9931291A2] The invention relates to a method for producing a boride layer on a surface by means of plasma boronizing in which a gas medium containing a boron dispenser medium is fed to a reactor (10), and a glow discharge is generated in said reactor (10). The invention also relates to a device which is especially suited for carrying out said method. Known methods for plasma boronizing of, for example, metallic surfaces are disadvantageous in that they do not lead to non-porous boride layers and are thus not suited for industrial series applications. According to the inventive method, the parameters of the production of the plasma produced in a treatment chamber (11) of the reactor (10) have to be selected such that an increased portion of excited boron particles is obtained in the plasma. Non-porous boride layers are acquired in this manner. The inventive method is suited, for example, for coatings of components which need to have a surface that is highly resistant to wear, as the components are subjected to an increased demand, for example, gears, camshafts and the like. Method parameters with which the production of the boride layer can be influenced are, for example, tension, pulse-duty factor, frequency, temperature, pressure during the production of the plasma and the content of boron dispensing medium, and the remaining components in the gas medium which is fed to the reactor (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 16/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 8/08 (2006.01); C23C 8/36 (2006.01); C23C 8/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 8/38 (2013.01); C23C 8/36 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9931291A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9931291 A2 19990624; WO 9931291 A3 19990910; AT 215132 T 20020415; CN 1198953 C 20050427; CN 1282383 A 20010131; EP 1044289 A2 20001018; EP 1044289 B1 20020327; EP 1143031 A2 20011010; EP 1143031 A3 20040428; JP 2002508448 A 20020319; JP 4588213 B2 20101124; US 6783794 B1 20040831

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081211

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120102

2012-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120703

2012-10-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59803574

- Effective date: 20120703

2012-09-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120831

2012-03-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59803574

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110111

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110117

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081211

2009-08-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081211

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071121

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071217

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-03-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021230

2002-12-11 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021211

2002-09-25 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-08-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-07-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020614

2002-06-27 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020627

2002-06-27 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020627

2002-05-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59803574 20020502

2002-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

2002-03-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 215132 T 20020415

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010125

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000717

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT PT SE