Global Patent Index - EP 1044311 A1

EP 1044311 A1 2000-10-18 - STRUCTURAL TIE SHEAR CONNECTOR FOR CONCRETE AND INSULATION SANDWICH WALLS

Title (en)

STRUCTURAL TIE SHEAR CONNECTOR FOR CONCRETE AND INSULATION SANDWICH WALLS

Title (de)

SCHUBVERBINDER FÜR SANDWICHMAUERN AUS BETON UND ISOLATIONSMATERIAL

Title (fr)

CONNECTEUR DE TIRANTS STRUCTURAUX POUR PAROIS SANDWICH ISOLANTES EN BETON

Publication

EP 1044311 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98964849 A

Priority

  • US 9827225 W
  • US 99790897 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9934071A1] A structural tie shear connector (20) utilized in a concrete and insulation sandwich wall panel (10) having first and second wythes (12, 14) and an insulation layer (16) interposed therebetween. The connector (20) includes first and second horizontal strands (22, 24) of thermally non-conductive material which are adapted to be encased by the respective wythes (12, 14). A transverse web (26) of thermally non-conductive material interconnects the first and second strands (22, 24) through the insulation layer (16). The web (26) includes strands formed into a lattice structure. At least one (30) of the strands (22, 24, 28, 30, 32) of the lattice extends at an angle with respect to one of the first and second strands (22, 24) so as to be in tension when a load is applied to the wall panel (10). The connector (20) resembles a bow tie. The method of making sandwich wall panels (10) disclosed herein includes pouring the first layer (14) of concrete into a form (50); laying a plurality of insulation strips (16A, 16B, 16C, etc.) adjacent each other to define at least one gap (52) therebetween; providing a bow tie shear connector (20) having a chairing loop portion (32) thereon; while the first layer (14) of concrete is still plastic, inserting the connector (20) through the gap (52) and into the first layer (14) of concrete such that the chairing loop portion (32) rests on the bottom of the form (50); and pouring a second layer (12) of wet concrete onto the insulation strips (16A, 16B, 16C, etc.) in the form (50). The chairing loop (32) positively locates the connector (20) with respect to the form (50), the concrete layers (12, 14) and the insulation layer (16) without being affixed to the insulation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04C 2/04; E04C 5/07

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04C 2/04 (2006.01); E04C 5/06 (2006.01); E04C 5/07 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04C 5/0645 (2013.01); E04C 2/044 (2013.01); E04C 5/07 (2013.01); E04C 2002/048 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9934071A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9934071 A1 19990708; AT 245743 T 20030815; AU 2008199 A 19990719; AU 755857 B2 20021219; CA 2316238 A1 19990708; CA 2316238 C 20060613; DE 69816665 D1 20030828; DE 69816665 T2 20040609; EP 1044311 A1 20001018; EP 1044311 B1 20030723; ES 2204003 T3 20040416

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151222

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20170710

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161229

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161227

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20161227

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20161202

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161228

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161227

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151222

2016-12-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-12-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-07-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040426

2004-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2204003 T3

2004-01-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-08-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69816665 P 20030828

2003-08-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: AMMANN PATENTANWAELTE AG BERN

2003-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2003-07-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-06-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DELTA-TIE, INC.

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010705

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000711

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI