Global Patent Index - EP 1044316 A1

EP 1044316 A1 2000-10-18 - METHOD FOR DRILLING AND COMPLETING A HYDROCARBON PRODUCTION WELL

Title (en)

METHOD FOR DRILLING AND COMPLETING A HYDROCARBON PRODUCTION WELL

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN UND VERROHREN VON ÖLPRODUKTIONSBOHRLÖCHERN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FORAGE ET D'ACHEVEMENT D'UN PUITS DE PRODUCTION D'HYDROCARBURES

Publication

EP 1044316 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98966700 A

Priority

  • EP 98966700 A
  • EP 9808549 W
  • EP 97204157 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9935368A1] A method for drilling and completing a hydrocarbon production well comprises the steps of: A) drilling a section of a borehole into an underground formation; inserting a casing into the drilled borehole section and radially expanding and securing the casing within said borehole section; B) lowering a drill bit through the expanded casing and drilling a subsequent section of the borehole; inserting a next casing into said subsequent section of the borehole and radially expanding and securing said next casing within said subsequent borehole section; and C) repeating, if required, step B a number of times until the borehole has reached the vicinity of a hydrocarbon bearing formation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 43/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 43/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 43/103 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9935368A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9935368 A1 19990715; AU 2418699 A 19990726; AU 740213 B2 20011101; BR 9814563 A 20001017; CA 2316978 A1 19990715; CA 2316978 C 20080129; DE 69808139 D1 20021024; DE 69808139 T2 20030605; DK 1044316 T3 20021104; EA 002563 B1 20020627; EA 200000724 A1 20010226; EP 1044316 A1 20001018; EP 1044316 B1 20020918; GC 0000041 A 20040630; JP 2002500306 A 20020108; JP 4085403 B2 20080514; MY 129529 A 20070430; NO 20003402 A 20000825; NO 20003402 D0 20000629; NO 322486 B1 20061009; NZ 505059 A 20030328; OA 11527 A 20040204; UA 71905 C2 20001115

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20161212

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161220

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161111

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161228

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20161212

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-11-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-02-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69808139 20021024

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB IT NL

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020301

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000531

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB IT NL