Global Patent Index - EP 1044323 A1

EP 1044323 A1 2000-10-18 - ELECTROMAGNETIC INJECTION VALVE

Title (en)

ELECTROMAGNETIC INJECTION VALVE

Title (de)

ELEKTROMAGNETISCHES EINSPRITZVENTIL

Title (fr)

INJECTEUR ELECTROMAGNETIQUE

Publication

EP 1044323 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99953630 A

Priority

  • DE 9902699 W
  • DE 19839863 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19839863C1] The invention relates to an electromagnetic injection valve (1) comprising two counterwound magnet coils (SP1, SP2) which have identical characteristic quantities and which are placed on the same magnetic circuit so that the force effects of the magnet coils (SP1, SP2) are nullified when they are flown through by the same excitation current. By virtue of the double coil (SP1, SP2) having a canceling effect, the actual energizing process of the valve (1), i.e. the opening of the same, is transformed in one of both coils in a deenergizing process. The rapid current decay is now determined by dimensioning the extinction voltage (UZD2). As a result, it is possible to obtain rapid force build-up times without increasing the supply voltage (Ubatt). The valve can be controlled by using a conventional switching output stage or by using a current-controlled switching output stage. It is also possible to shorten the closing process by reversing the differential current (Id) during deenergizing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/20; H01F 7/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 51/06 (2006.01); F02D 41/20 (2006.01); F02M 51/08 (2006.01); F16K 31/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/20 (2013.01); F02D 2041/2041 (2013.01); F02D 2041/2044 (2013.01); F02D 2041/2079 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0014395A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19839863 C1 19991028; EP 1044323 A1 20001018; EP 1044323 B1 20031029; JP 2002524683 A 20020806; US 6657846 B1 20031202; WO 0014395 A1 20000316

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120301

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110831

2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110828

2012-06-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59907542

- Effective date: 20120301

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110828

2012-05-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120430

2012-04-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110828

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101025

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100823

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100901

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100825

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-10-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040730

2004-07-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-06-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-03-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040209

2003-12-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59907542 P 20031204

2003-11-26 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-10-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-10-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000918

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE