Global Patent Index - EP 1044328 A1

EP 1044328 A1 2000-10-18 - PUMP NOZZLE OF A TYPE WITH AN OPEN INJECTION NOZZLE

Title (en)

PUMP NOZZLE OF A TYPE WITH AN OPEN INJECTION NOZZLE

Title (de)

PUMPEDÜSE VOM TYP MIT OFFENER EINSPRITZDÜSE

Title (fr)

GICLEUR DE POMPE DU TYPE A INJECTEUR OUVERT

Publication

EP 1044328 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98960860 A

Priority

  • AT 9800322 W
  • DE 19758066 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19758066A1] The invention relates to a pump nozzle of a type with an open injection nozzle. The pump nozzle is comprised of a nozzle body (1) with an axial chamber (4) which ends in a nozzle cap (3). The nozzle also has an injection piston (15) which serves as an end element and which is guided in the axial chamber. The injection piston forms a pressure chamber (23) in the axial chamber. The spray orifices (60, 61) of an upper (60) and a lower (61) row exit from said pressure chamber. In order to be able to adapt the nozzle cross-section to all operating states, the injection piston (15) has an axial orifice (30) in which a coaxial piston needle (31) is guided in a longitudinal direction of the nozzle. The needle part (33) interacts with a seating (62) formed with the interior of the nozzle cap (3). The seating is arranged underneath the upper row of spray orifices (60), and a compression spring (35) which operates in a downward direction is provided over the piston part (32) of the piston needle (31). The piston needle forms a control chamber (50) which is located underneath the piston part (32) of said needle and in the axial orifice (30). A control medium which can be fed to the control chamber lifts the piston needle (31) against the force of the compression spring (35) in relation to the injection piston (15).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 57/02; F02M 61/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 57/02 (2006.01); F02M 61/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/10 (2013.01); F02M 57/021 (2013.01); F02M 57/024 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9934114A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19758066 A1 19990701; EP 1044328 A1 20001018; EP 1044328 B1 20020918; US 6257507 B1 20010710; WO 9934114 A1 19990708

INPADOC legal status


2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071223

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080701

2008-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071223

2006-12-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061221

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-12-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061218

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-03-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030220

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805646 20021024

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MORELL, JOSEF

2002-09-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHMIDT, HARALD

2002-09-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DOLENC, ANTON

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010706

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000727

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB