Global Patent Index - EP 1044349 A1

EP 1044349 A1 2000-10-18 - AUTOMOBILE HEAT EXCHANGER MODULE COMPRISING A FAN SHROUD AND A HEAT EXCHANGER, IN PARTICULAR FOR MOTOR VEHICLE

Title (en)

AUTOMOBILE HEAT EXCHANGER MODULE COMPRISING A FAN SHROUD AND A HEAT EXCHANGER, IN PARTICULAR FOR MOTOR VEHICLE

Title (de)

WÄRMEAUSTAUSCHMODUL MIT LÜFTERHAUBE UND WÄRMETAUSCHER INSBESONDERE FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUG

Title (fr)

MODULE D'ECHANGE DE CHALEUR COMPRENANT UNE BUSE DE VENTILATEUR ET UN ECHANGEUR DE CHALEUR, EN PARTICULIER POUR VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE

Publication

EP 1044349 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99950851 A

Priority

  • FR 9902618 W
  • FR 9813586 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2785379A1] The invention concerns a heat exchanger, in particular for motor vehicle, comprising a fan shroud (12) mounted on a heat exchanger (10). The shroud (12) comprises at least two blocks (34) to be engaged in the housings (38) of a first collector box (16) of the heat exchanger, and at least two elastic snap-on brackets (42) each provided with an opening (58) for allowing through a pin (60) projecting from a side surface of a second collector box (18) of the heat exchanger.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28F 9/00; F04D 29/58; F04D 29/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/58 (2006.01); F04D 29/60 (2006.01); F28F 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/601 (2013.01); F04D 29/582 (2013.01); F28F 9/002 (2013.01); F28F 2275/085 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0026599A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2785379 A1 20000505; FR 2785379 B1 20010615; BR 9907072 A 20001017; DE 69916015 D1 20040506; DE 69916015 T2 20040812; EP 1044349 A1 20001018; EP 1044349 B1 20040331; US 6315034 B1 20011113; WO 0026599 A1 20000511

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20161013

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-03-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050104

2004-09-29 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-07-12 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040712

2004-05-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69916015

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-05-06

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2004-03-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040331

2003-02-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030109

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000621

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT