Global patent index - EP 1044369 A1

EP 1044369 A1 2000-10-18 - MEASUREMENT SENSOR FOR DETERMINING AN OXYGEN CONCENTRATION IN A GAS MIXTURE

Title (en)

MEASUREMENT SENSOR FOR DETERMINING AN OXYGEN CONCENTRATION IN A GAS MIXTURE

Title (de)

MESSFÜHLER ZUM BESTIMMEN EINER SAUERSTOFFKONZENTRATION IN EINEM GASGEMISCH

Title (fr)

SONDE DE MESURE PERMETTANT DE DETERMINER LA CONCENTRATION EN OXYGENE D'UN MELANGE GAZEUX

Publication

EP 1044369 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99968712 A

Priority

  • DE 9902124 W
  • DE 19840888 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19840888A1] The invention relates to a measurement sensor (10) for determining an oxygen concentration in a gas mixture, notably in exhaust gases of internal combustion engines. The sensor comprises a Nernst measurement cell (19) which has a first electrode (Nernst electrode) which is exposed to the gas mixture to be measured via a diffusion barrier (22), a second electrode (18) (reference electrode) which is exposed to a reference gas and a solid electrolyte body (20) which is positioned between the first and the second electrode. The sensor further comprises a pump cell (14) which has a first electrode (40) (inner pump electrode) which is exposed to the gas mixture to be measured via a diffusion barrier (22), and a second electrode (outer pump electrode) which is also exposed to the gas mixture, as well as a solid electrolyte body (42) which is positioned between the first and the second electrode. The Nernst electrode (16) and the inner pump electrode (38) at least in sections are connected via a common supply line to a circuit for the purpose of controlling and evaluating the measurement sensor.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 27/419; G01N 27/406

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 27/419 (2006.01); G01N 27/406 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 27/4065 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0014525A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19840888 A1 20000316; EP 1044369 A1 20001018; JP 2002524733 A 20020806; US 6818111 B1 20041116; WO 0014525 A1 20000316

INPADOC legal status

2009-08-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20090213

2007-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20070621

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000918

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE