Global Patent Index - EP 1044389 A2

EP 1044389 A2 2000-10-18 - ACTIVELY CONTROLLABLE MULTIFOCAL LENS

Title (en)

ACTIVELY CONTROLLABLE MULTIFOCAL LENS

Title (de)

AKTIV STEUERBARE MULTIFOKALE LINSE

Title (fr)

LENTILLE MULTIFOCALE ACTIVEMENT REGULABLE

Publication

EP 1044389 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98965876 A

Priority

  • EP 9808465 W
  • US 99937197 A
  • US 19262598 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9934239A2] The invention provides an active multifocal optical lens. The optical lens has a first optical element that provides a first optical power and a second optical element that provides a second optical power. The second optical element is a volume holographic optical element, which has been programmed to focus incoming light. The invention provides further a cross-linkable or polymerizable optical material that is suitable for producing a biocompatible holographic optical element. The optical material is a rapidly cross-linking or polymerizing material that changes from a fluid state to a solid state within a limited duration after being exposed to a light source.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G02B 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02B 3/10 (2006.01); G02B 5/32 (2006.01); G02B 7/04 (2006.01); G02C 7/00 (2006.01); G02C 7/04 (2006.01); G02C 7/06 (2006.01); G03H 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G02C 7/049 (2013.01); G02B 3/10 (2013.01); G02B 5/32 (2013.01); G02B 7/04 (2013.01); G02C 7/00 (2013.01); G02C 7/041 (2013.01); G02C 7/043 (2013.01); G02C 7/044 (2013.01); G02C 7/048 (2013.01); G02C 7/06 (2013.01); G02C 2202/16 (2013.01); G02C 2202/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9934239A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9934239 A2 19990708; WO 9934239 A3 19991021; AU 2163599 A 19990719; AU 747773 B2 20020523; BR 9814529 A 20001017; CA 2315377 A1 19990708; CN 1283280 A 20010207; EP 1044389 A2 20001018; HU 0101150 A2 20010730; IL 136423 D0 20010614; JP 2002500379 A 20020108; NO 20003381 A 20000828; NO 20003381 D0 20000628; PL 341710 A1 20010423; TW 422855 B 20010221

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040702

2003-03-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVARTIS AG

2003-03-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVARTIS PHARMA GMBH

2003-03-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVARTIS AG

2003-03-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVARTIS PHARMA GMBH

2001-08-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVARTIS AG

2001-08-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVARTIS-ERFINDUNGEN VERWALTUNGSGESELLSCHAFT M.B.

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000526

2000-11-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 02B 7/04 A, 7G 02C 7/06 B, 7G 02B 3/10 B

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE