Global Patent Index - EP 1044428 A1

EP 1044428 A1 2000-10-18 - DEVICE FOR COUNTING SHEET-LIKE OBJECTS

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR COUNTING SHEET-LIKE OBJECTS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM ZÄHLEN VON FLÄCHIGEN GEGENSTÄNDEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR COMPTER DES OBJETS PLANS

Publication

EP 1044428 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98960983 A

Priority

  • CH 9800559 W
  • CH 298497 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9935613A1] The invention relates to a conveyor device driven at a conveying speed (v1) in a direction of conveyance (F) and designed for transporting objects (10) arranged in an overlapping arrangement (S) in which each object rests on the following one. A contact element (26) mounted on a guiding means (22) extending in the direction of conveyance (F) is moved back and forth by means of a drive (34). Said contact element (26) in at least one section of the guiding means (22) moves in the direction of conveyance (F) at a speed (v2) which is greater than the conveying speed (v1). When the contact element (26) comes into contact with the rear edge (18) of an object (10) a signal is sent to the counter (48). The guiding means (22) arranged above the conveyor device (12) is immovably connected to a reference element (56) which is designed to contact the arrangement (S) from above.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06M 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06M 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06M 7/00 (2013.01); G06M 2207/02 (2013.01); Y10S 198/958 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9935613A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9935613 A1 19990715; AU 1658399 A 19990726; AU 750749 B2 20020725; CA 2311397 A1 19990715; DE 59802276 D1 20020110; DK 1044428 T3 20020211; EP 1044428 A1 20001018; EP 1044428 B1 20011128; US 6349125 B1 20020219

INPADOC legal status


2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-10-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59802276

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59802276

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121220

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20121205

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-01-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090105

2009-08-10 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2008-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20071214

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-12-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051229

2005-10-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-08-17 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041229

2005-08-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-02-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: FERAG AG

- Free text: FERAG AG#ZUERICHSTRASSE 74#8340 HINWIL (CH) -TRANSFER TO- FERAG AG#PATENTABTEILUNG Z. H. MARKUS FELIX ZUERICHSTRASSE 74#8340 HINWIL (CH)

2004-12-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041230

2004-12-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041229

2003-12-09 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031209

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-12-02 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20031202

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-11-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20031126

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-09-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030701

2003-07-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030701

2002-11-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-03-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020216

2002-02-11 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-01-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802276 20020110

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2001-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-11-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-06-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010425

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000607

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL SE