Global Patent Index - EP 1044429 A1

EP 1044429 A1 2000-10-18 - DEVICE FOR COUNTING PRODUCTS CONVEYED AS AN OVERLAPPING ARRANGEMENT

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR COUNTING PRODUCTS CONVEYED AS AN OVERLAPPING ARRANGEMENT

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM ZÄHLEN VON IN EINER SCHUPPENFORMATION GEFÖRDERTEN ERZEUGNISSEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR COMPTER DES PRODUITS ACHEMINES EN UNE FORMATION A RECOUVREMENT

Publication

EP 1044429 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98960984 A

Priority

  • CH 9800560 W
  • CH 298597 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9935614A1] The invention relates to a conveyor device (12) which transports objects arranged as an overlapping arrangement in the direction of conveyance (F) at a conveying speed (v1). The counting device (20) comprises an infeed element (36) which is moved in the direction of conveyance at a speed (v2) which is greater than the conveying speed (v1). A detecting element (42) is positioned opposite the infeed element (38). When the counting device (20) catches up with an object (16) the end section (18') of said object lies between the infeed element (36) and the detecting element (42), which causes a signal to be sent to a counter (48).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06M 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06M 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06M 7/00 (2013.01); G06M 2207/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9935614A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9935614 A1 19990715; AU 1658499 A 19990726; AU 746281 B2 20020418; CA 2308756 A1 19990715; DE 59805137 D1 20020912; DK 1044429 T3 20021202; EP 1044429 A1 20001018; EP 1044429 B1 20020807; US 6359954 B1 20020319

INPADOC legal status


2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-09-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59805137

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2014-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59805137

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121220

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121205

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-01-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090105

2009-08-10 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2008-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071214

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-12-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051229

2005-10-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-08-17 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20041229

2005-08-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2005-02-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: FERAG AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2004-12-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041230

2004-12-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041229

2003-12-09 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031209

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-12-02 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031202

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-11-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031126

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-09-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20030701

2003-07-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030508

2003-07-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030701

2003-03-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-12-02 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2002-11-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-09-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59805137

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-09-12

2002-08-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2002-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-08-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020124

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000613

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL SE