Global Patent Index - EP 1044433 A1

EP 1044433 A1 2000-10-18 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING ACCESS TO A RESOURCE LIMITED TO CERTAIN TIME FRAMES

Title (en)

METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING ACCESS TO A RESOURCE LIMITED TO CERTAIN TIME FRAMES

Title (de)

AUF BESTIMMTE STUNDENBEREICHE BEGRENZTES ZUGANGSKONTROLLSYSTEM ZU EINEM BETRIEBSMITTEL UND DAZUGEHÖRIGES VERFAHREN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE CONTROLE D'ACCES A UNE RESSOURCE LIMITE A CERTAINES PLAGES HORAIRES

Publication

EP 1044433 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99900508 A

Priority

  • FR 9900023 W
  • FR 9800125 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2773405A1] The invention concerns a method for controlling the access of an electronic key to an electronic lock inside a predetermined time frame which consists in; initialising the lock with a reference metering value; then, at each attempt for accessing the lock with the key: reading in the key a previously stored time frame; storing a current time value delivered by the real time clock; transmitting from the key to the lock the time frame and the current time value; and, in the lock: verifying the coherence of the current time value with the time frame; in case of coherence, authorising access, and updating the reference metering value, on the basis of the current time value transmitted; otherwise, prohibiting the key from accessing the lock.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 49/00 (2006.01); G07C 9/00 (2006.01); G09C 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07C 9/00023 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9935617A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

FR 2773405 A1 19990709; FR 2773405 B1 20000929; DE 69912737 D1 20031218; EP 1044433 A1 20001018; EP 1044433 B1 20031112; JP 2002501134 A 20020115; WO 9935617 A1 19990715

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040813

2004-05-12 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20031112

2004-02-13 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040213

2003-12-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69912737 P 20031218

2003-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2003-11-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-11-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031112

2002-02-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020111

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000623

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB