Global Patent Index - EP 1044488 A1

EP 1044488 A1 2000-10-18 - LASER WITH AN ORGANIC EMITTER MATERIAL AND DISTRIBUTED FEEDBACK

Title (en)

LASER WITH AN ORGANIC EMITTER MATERIAL AND DISTRIBUTED FEEDBACK

Title (de)

LASER MIT EINEM ORGANISCHEN EMITTERMATERIAL UND VERTEILTER RÜCKKOPPLUNG

Title (fr)

LASER A MATERIAU EMETTEUR ORGANIQUE ET RETROACTION REPARTIE

Publication

EP 1044488 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98966858 A

Priority

  • DE 19758257 A
  • DE 19805993 A
  • EP 9808514 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9935721A1] The invention relates to a laser comprised of at least one organic emitter material which is capable of stimulated emission of light and which has a two-dimensional construction. The invention also comprises means for optically, electrically and or chemically pumping the emitter material. According to the invention, waveguide modes exist which are guided in the emitter material, and the laser structure is spatially modulated in a periodic manner. The inventive laser is characterized in that at least one surface of the emitter material is in contact with an additional layer (i.e. boundary layer).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01S 3/06; H01S 3/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01S 3/063 (2006.01); H01S 3/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01S 3/0635 (2013.01); H01S 3/168 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9935721A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9935721 A1 19990715; EP 1044488 A1 20001018

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030702

2003-11-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FOERDERUNG DERANGEWAND

2002-06-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2001-03-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010202

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000725

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE