Global Patent Index - EP 1044534 A1

EP 1044534 A1 2000-10-18 - ENCODING METHOD FOR CARRYING OUT CRYPTOGRAPHIC OPERATIONS

Title (en)

ENCODING METHOD FOR CARRYING OUT CRYPTOGRAPHIC OPERATIONS

Title (de)

VERSCHLÜSSELUNGSVERFAHREN ZUM AUSFÜHREN VON KRYPTOGRAPHISCHEN OPERATIONEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE CODAGE PERMETTANT D'EXECUTER DES OPERATIONS CRYPTOGRAPHIQUES

Publication

EP 1044534 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99948821 A

Priority

  • DE 19845096 A
  • DE 19936890 A
  • EP 9907019 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0019657A1] The invention relates to an encoding method according to which a partial cryptographic operation is carried out by data which are digitally stored as at least one data bit word in a memory cell (1) or a register. To provide such a system which effectively prevents successful cryptanalysis by observation of a current consumption of a data processing unit, the invention provides for a data bit word generated on the basis of random numbers to be stored in a memory cell (10) before a data bit word is written into same.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04L 9/06; G06F 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 12/14 (2006.01); G06F 21/55 (2013.01); G06F 21/72 (2013.01); G06F 21/75 (2013.01); H04L 9/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 21/72 (2013.01); G06F 21/75 (2013.01); G06F 21/755 (2017.08); H04L 9/003 (2013.01); G06F 2207/7219 (2013.01); G06F 2221/2123 (2013.01); H04L 2209/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0019657 A1 20000406; EP 1044534 A1 20001018; JP 2002526849 A 20020820

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050915

2005-06-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050504

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY & STANDARDS GMBH

2002-10-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2002-10-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS CORPORATE INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001006

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE