Global patent index - EP 1044535 A1

EP 1044535 A1 2000-10-18 - METHOD FOR OPTIMISING ACCESSES TO THE SET OF OBJECT INSTANCES OF A COMMON CLASS IN A MANAGEMENT INFORMATION BASE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR OPTIMISING ACCESSES TO THE SET OF OBJECT INSTANCES OF A COMMON CLASS IN A MANAGEMENT INFORMATION BASE

Title (de)

VERRAHREN ZUR OPTIMISIERUNG VON ZUGANG ZU EINER GRUPPE VON INSTANZEN VON OBJEKTEN IN EINER VERWALTUNGSDATENBANK

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'OPTIMISATION DES ACCES A L'ENSEMBLE DES INSTANCES D'OBJETS D'UNE MEME CLASSE DANS UNE BASE DE DONNEES D'ADMINISTRATION

Publication

EP 1044535 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99950878 A

Priority

  • FR 9902647 W
  • FR 9813646 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2785410A1] The invention concerns a method for optimising accesses to the set of all the managed instances of objects of a specific common class, present in a management information base (MIB) with hierarchy in the form of a tree of object instances of various classes, comprising a step which consists in automatic generation by a manager (CMIS-DB) of the local management information base (MIB), of an object instance of specific class mocExtension predefined to represent the set of all the instances of managed object classes (MOC) present in the object manager (CMIS-DB), to enable the object manager (CMIS-DB) to maintain automatically a virtual copy of all the instances of class objects (MOC) represented by said instance of specific class mocExtension .

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04L 12/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 17/30 (2006.01); H04L 12/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 17/30607 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0027073A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

FR 2785410 A1 20000505; FR 2785410 B1 20020125; EP 1044535 A1 20001018; WO 0027073 A1 20000511

INPADOC legal status

2007-05-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20061018

2006-11-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EVIDIAN

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001113

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE