Global Patent Index - EP 1044549 A1

EP 1044549 A1 2000-10-18 - TELEPHONE WITH MEANS FOR ENHANCING THE SUBJECTIVE SIGNAL IMPRESSION IN THE PRESENCE OF NOISE

Title (en)

TELEPHONE WITH MEANS FOR ENHANCING THE SUBJECTIVE SIGNAL IMPRESSION IN THE PRESENCE OF NOISE

Title (de)

TELEFON MIT MITTELN ZUR ERHÖHUNG DES SUBJEKTIVEN SIGNALEINDRUCKS IN DER ANWESENHEIT VON RAUSCHEN

Title (fr)

TELEPHONE AVEC DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT D'AMELIORER L'IMPRESSION DE SIGNAL SUBJECTIVE EN PRESENCE DE BRUIT

Publication

EP 1044549 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99952451 A

Priority

  • EP 9906787 W
  • FR 9812159 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2783991A1] The invention comprises the dynamic compression of an audio signal for enhancing the subjective impression of this signal in the presence of noise: the compression of the dynamic of a signal in fact corresponds to a multiplication of each sample of this signal by a gain that depends on the amplitude of said sample. The proposed compression method is completely adaptive, because it comprises a step of selecting a compression law from various possible laws as a function of the measured noise. This selection step takes into account the level of the local noise (Ni) and of the remote noise (Nr), that is, the noise contained in the received audio signal. Application: Notably mobile telephony.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04M 1/60; H03G 3/32; H03G 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10L 19/00 (2006.01); H03G 3/32 (2006.01); H03G 7/06 (2006.01); H04M 1/00 (2006.01); H04M 1/60 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H03G 3/32 (2013.01); H03G 7/06 (2013.01); H04M 1/6016 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0019686A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2783991 A1 20000331; CN 1289500 A 20010328; EP 1044549 A1 20001018; JP 2002526983 A 20020820; KR 20010032522 A 20010425; TW 444488 B 20010701; WO 0019686 A1 20000406

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050401

2005-04-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050224

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-03-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CELLON FRANCE SAS

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001006

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE