Global Patent Index - EP 1044565 A4

EP 1044565 A4 2001-02-28 - IMAGING METHOD AND SYSTEM WITH ELONGATE INSPECTION ZONE

Title (en)

IMAGING METHOD AND SYSTEM WITH ELONGATE INSPECTION ZONE

Title (de)

BILDAUFNAHMEVERFAHREN UND-VORRICHTUNG MIT LÄNGLICHER INSPEKTIONSZONE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET SYSTEME D'INSPECTION AVEC ZONE D'INSPECTION ALLONGEE

Publication

EP 1044565 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98946058 A

Priority

  • US 9819054 W
  • US 94895697 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9920048A1] An elongate inspection system and method for providing a uniform illumination field to a desired inspection zone for inspection of a desired area of an object to be inspected. The elongate inspection system defines an inspection plane extending between an inspection device and the object to be inspected. A primary illumination for the inspection system is provided both from the left (54) and from the right (54) of the inspection plane and a secondary illumination (62) is provided along and coincident with the inspection plane. The primary (54) and secondary (62) illumination combine to provide a contiguous uniform illumination field (27, 29) to facilitate accurate inspection of the desired feature, characteristic or attribute of the object to be inspected.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 7/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 21/88 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 21/8901 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • No further relevant documents disclosed
  • See also references of WO 9920048A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9920048 A1 19990422; AU 9315498 A 19990503; EP 1044565 A1 20001018; EP 1044565 A4 20010228

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031202

2003-07-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030523

2002-08-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ROBOTIC VISION SYSTEMS, INC.

2001-02-28 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010116

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000720

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE