Global patent index - EP 1044620 A1

EP 1044620 A1 2000-10-18 - Closure device for shoes

Title (en)

Closure device for shoes

Title (de)

Dispositif de fermeture pour chaussures

Title (fr)

Dispositif de fermeture pour chaussures

Publication

EP 1044620 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00107193 A

Priority

IT TV990041 A

Abstract (en)

A closure device for shoes, which comprises a first main rack (3) and a second auxiliary rack (5). The engagement element allows easier and more comfortable closure of the shoe and/or allows to increase the adjustment range for closure. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43C 11/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43C 11/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43C 11/1453 (2013.01); A43C 11/1406 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1044620 A1 20001018; EP 1044620 B1 20031015; DE 60005880 D1 20031120; DE 60005880 T2 20040729; IT 1311645 B1 20020314; IT TV990041 A1 20001016; IT TV990041 D0 19990416

INPADOC legal status

2005-04-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050412

2005-02-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-11-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-10-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040716

2004-07-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-11-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60005880

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-11-20

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-10-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2003-08-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NORDICA S.P.A

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-03-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030116

2001-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR IT

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010321

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI