Global Patent Index - EP 1044621 A2

EP 1044621 A2 2000-10-18 - Reversible anti-skid device for shoesoles

Title (en)

Reversible anti-skid device for shoesoles

Title (de)

Umkehrbare Gleitschutzvorrichtung für Schuhsohle

Title (fr)

Dispositif antiderapant reversible pour semelles de chaussures

Publication

EP 1044621 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 99410151 A

Priority

  • FR 9814177 A
  • FR 9902840 A
  • FR 9911443 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2785508A1] The non-slip insert for a footwear sole fits in a seating (1) fitted into the sole (23). The seating has a recess to receive the insert which is reversible. The insert is held in the selected position in the seating by lateral screws (4,17) which fit through the sole and seating to engage notches in the sides of the insert.

Abstract (fr)

Dispositif antidérapant destiné à être introduit dans la semelle ou le talon de chaussures traditionnelle ou sportive afin quelles puissent adhérer sur des sols devenus glissants. Le dispositif antidérapant pour semelles et / ou talons de chaussures traditionnelles ou sportives est caractérisé en ce qu'il est constitué d'un logement (1) (1-15) (1- 23) destiné à être inséré dans la semelle (23) et / ou le talon (20) dans lequel est aménagé un espace destiné à la réception d'un élément (2) réversible muni de moyens antidérapants (7) sur une face et d'un revêtement correspondant à celui de la semelle (23) et / ou du talon (20) sur la face opposée et pourvu sur sa ou ses faces latérales de moyens de fixations dans le logement (1) dans ses deux positions inversées et en ce que sont prévus en outre des moyens de blocage (4) - (17) du dit élément dans les deux dites positions de fixation. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43C 15/00; A43B 13/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 13/24 (2006.01); A43C 15/00 (2006.01); A43C 15/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 13/24 (2013.01); A43C 15/00 (2013.01); A43C 15/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2785508 A1 20000512; FR 2785508 B1 20010105; EP 1044621 A2 20001018; EP 1044621 A3 20001115

INPADOC legal status


2002-04-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010516

2001-09-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI