Global Patent Index - EP 1044621 A3

EP 1044621 A3 2000-11-15 - Reversible anti-skid device for shoesoles

Title (en)

Reversible anti-skid device for shoesoles

Title (de)

Umkehrbare Gleitschutzvorrichtung für Schuhsohle

Title (fr)

Dispositif antiderapant reversible pour semelles de chaussures

Publication

EP 1044621 A3 (FR)

Application

EP 99410151 A

Priority

  • FR 9814177 A
  • FR 9902840 A
  • FR 9911443 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2785508A1] The non-slip insert for a footwear sole fits in a seating (1) fitted into the sole (23). The seating has a recess to receive the insert which is reversible. The insert is held in the selected position in the seating by lateral screws (4,17) which fit through the sole and seating to engage notches in the sides of the insert.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43C 15/00; A43B 13/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 13/24 (2006.01); A43C 15/00 (2006.01); A43C 15/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 13/24 (2013.01); A43C 15/00 (2013.01); A43C 15/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2785508 A1 20000512; FR 2785508 B1 20010105; EP 1044621 A2 20001018; EP 1044621 A3 20001115

INPADOC legal status


2002-04-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010516

2001-09-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI