Global Patent Index - EP 1044626 A2

EP 1044626 A2 2000-10-18 - Dispensing container for a product, especially cosmetics, with a rotary actuating member

Title (en)

Dispensing container for a product, especially cosmetics, with a rotary actuating member

Title (de)

Produktabgabebehälter, insbesondere für kosmetische Produkte, mit einem drehbaren Betätigungsorgan

Title (fr)

Récipient distributeur de produit, notamment cosmétique, comportant un organe de manoeuvre rotatif

Publication

EP 1044626 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 00110311 A

Priority

  • EP 95402644 A
  • FR 9414150 A

Abstract (en)

Recipient comprises base cup (9) having threaded aperture (10) in center crossed by screw (11), with 10 mm thread and extend along full length of recipient's body (2). Head (13) of screw has lateral wall (25) parallel to recipient axis (6) and extending downwards. Cover (27) is clipped on lateral wall using rib (28) entering in retaining groove (26). Cover has inner reinforcing cylindrical wall (29) used as plug avoiding air to enter body through inner canal (30) of screw

Abstract (fr)

Récipient pour produits, notamment cosmétiques, se présentant sous forme de pain solide, comportant un corps cylindrique ouvert à l'une de ses extrémités, se trouvant au contact du produit, une coupelle axialement mobile dans ce corps, destinée à supporter le produit, et un organe de manoeuvre rotatif comportant une paroi latérale permettant sa préhension, monté sur le corps à l'opposé de son extrémité ouverte et relié à la coupelle par un vérin à vis comportant une tête (13, 25) de vis, le corps du récipient et l'organe de manoeuvre (5) présentant une section transversale allongée, caractérisé par le fait que le vérin à vis (10, 11) présente un pas compris entre 4 et 20 mm, par le fait que la tête de la vis communique avec l'intérieur du récipient et par le fait qu'il comporte un capot (27) encliqueté sur la tête de la vis pour empêcher l'air de pénétrer dans le corps du récipient. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45D 40/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 40/04 (2006.01); A45D 40/26 (2006.01); B65D 83/76 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45D 40/04 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0713660 A1 19960529; EP 0713660 B1 20050608; DE 69534260 D1 20050714; DE 69534260 T2 20060323; EP 1044626 A2 20001018; EP 1044626 A3 20020417; ES 2242188 T3 20051101; FR 2727294 A1 19960531; FR 2727294 B1 19970103

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031112

2003-01-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2002-10-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020829

2002-04-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-04-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT;LV;SI

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010224

2000-10-18 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 713660

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT;LV;SI