Global patent index - EP 1044638 A3

EP 1044638 A3 2001-03-21 - Newspaper and/or magazine vending machine

Title (en)

Newspaper and/or magazine vending machine

Title (de)

Verkaufsgerät für Zeitungen und/oder Zeitschriften

Title (fr)

Distributeur de journaux et/ou de magazines

Publication

EP 1044638 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00107056 A

Priority

IT TV990039 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1044638A2] A newspaper and/or magazine vending machine (1) comprising a box-like container (3) which has a swing-down front door (4). The vending machine contains a lifting unit (6) for newspapers and/or magazines which are arranged so that their base rests on a feeder (7). The vending machine also contains means (16,17,18) for selecting a single newspaper and/or magazine following preliminary selection and/or payment on the part of a user. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47F 1/04; A47F 1/12; A47F 7/14; G07F 11/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 11/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 11/045 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1044638 A2 20001018; EP 1044638 A3 20010321; IT 1311824 B1 20020319; IT TV990039 A1 20001013; IT TV990039 D0 19990413

INPADOC legal status

2002-08-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-07-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010922

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI