Global patent index - EP 1044639 A2

EP 1044639 A2 2000-10-18 - Low temperature showcase

Title (en)

Low temperature showcase

Title (de)

Niedrigtemperatur-Schauvitrine

Title (fr)

Présentoir à basse température

Publication

EP 1044639 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00302635 A

Priority

JP 9137799 A

Abstract (en)

A low temperature showcase having an air passage (7) provided in the bottom portion of a heat insulating body (2) with inner and outer air passages (5,6) therein in communication therewith. The air passage (7) has a double structure and is provided in the rear of the heat insulating body (2). A plurality of fans (11,12) are mounted in a casing (13) for supplying air to the outer and inner air passages (5,6) are provided in the bottom air passage (7) and arranged across the width thereof in substantially the same plane. A partition wall (17) is provided in the outlet from the casing (13) housing said fans (11,12). An outer air passage opening (18) is provided in the wall (17) through which air is blown from each fan (11) into the outer air passage (5). An inner air passage opening (19) is provided in the wall (17) through which air is blown from each fan (12) into the inner air passage (6). At least the outer air passage opening (18) is formed in substantially all of the area in a longitudinal direction of the wall (17). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47F 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25D 17/08 (2006.01); A47F 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47F 3/0408 (2013.01); A47F 3/0482 (2013.01); F25D 2400/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1044639 A2 20001018; EP 1044639 A3 20010314; EP 1044639 B1 20040602; CN 1148136 C 20040505; CN 1268656 A 20001004; ES 2219269 T3 20041201; JP 2000283629 A 20001013; JP 4033576 B2 20080116; TW 466326 B 20011201

INPADOC legal status

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100330

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110404

2011-04-15 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20110415

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100329

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100329

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-12-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20101130

2010-11-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100329

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090316

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090317

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090401

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090325

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-05-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050303

2004-12-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2219269

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

2004-06-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2001-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: ES FR GB IT

2001-10-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010809

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI