Global Patent Index - EP 1044639 A3

EP 1044639 A3 2001-03-14 - Low temperature showcase

Title (en)

Low temperature showcase

Title (de)

Niedrigtemperatur-Schauvitrine

Title (fr)

Présentoir à basse température

Publication

EP 1044639 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00302635 A

Priority

JP 9137799 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1044639A2] A low temperature showcase having an air passage (7) provided in the bottom portion of a heat insulating body (2) with inner and outer air passages (5,6) therein in communication therewith. The air passage (7) has a double structure and is provided in the rear of the heat insulating body (2). A plurality of fans (11,12) are mounted in a casing (13) for supplying air to the outer and inner air passages (5,6) are provided in the bottom air passage (7) and arranged across the width thereof in substantially the same plane. A partition wall (17) is provided in the outlet from the casing (13) housing said fans (11,12). An outer air passage opening (18) is provided in the wall (17) through which air is blown from each fan (11) into the outer air passage (5). An inner air passage opening (19) is provided in the wall (17) through which air is blown from each fan (12) into the inner air passage (6). At least the outer air passage opening (18) is formed in substantially all of the area in a longitudinal direction of the wall (17). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47F 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25D 17/08 (2006.01); A47F 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47F 3/0408 (2013.01); A47F 3/0482 (2013.01); F25D 2400/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1044639 A2 20001018; EP 1044639 A3 20010314; EP 1044639 B1 20040602; CN 1148136 C 20040505; CN 1268656 A 20001004; ES 2219269 T3 20041201; JP 2000283629 A 20001013; JP 4033576 B2 20080116; TW 466326 B 20011201

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100330

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110404

2011-04-15 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110415

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100329

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100329

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-12-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101130

2010-11-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100329

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090316

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090317

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090401

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090325

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-05-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050303

2004-12-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2219269 T3

2004-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

2004-06-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: ES FR GB IT

2001-10-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010809

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI