Global patent index - EP 1044640 A2

EP 1044640 A2 2000-10-18 - Ice cream counter provided with one or more rotating drums for the support of ice cream tubs

Title (en)

Ice cream counter provided with one or more rotating drums for the support of ice cream tubs

Title (de)

Speiseeisverkaufstheke mit einem oder mehreren Drehtrommeln zur Halterung von Eisbehältern

Title (fr)

Comptoir pour la vente de crème glacée comprenant un ou plusieurs tambours rotatifs destinés à supporter les récipients remplis de crème glacée

Publication

EP 1044640 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00830284 A

Priority

IT AN990019 U

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to an ice cream counter (1) provided with one or more rotating drums (5) with housings (6a,6b) to hold the ice cream tubs. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47F 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47F 3/04 (2006.01); A47F 3/06 (2006.01); F25D 25/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47F 3/0486 (2013.01); A47F 3/06 (2013.01); F25D 25/027 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1044640 A2 20001018; EP 1044640 A3 20021030; IT 248933 Y1 20030306; IT AN990019 U1 20001016; IT AN990019 V0 19990415

INPADOC legal status

2004-03-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030502

2003-08-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI