Global Patent Index - EP 1044641 A2

EP 1044641 A2 2000-10-18 - Clothing hanger

Title (en)

Clothing hanger

Title (de)

Kleiderbügel

Title (fr)

Cintre pour vêtements

Publication

EP 1044641 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00106918 A

Priority

DE 19916466 A

Abstract (en)

The clothes hanger has a support element (2) for a jacket, or other item of clothing, and a hook (1), which has a curved or cropped area, to surround a rod (3) and a straight part to fix to the support element. The curved area has a supporting surface extending longitudinally along the rod, to clamp or wedge it onto the rod. The support element and hook can be rotated with resp to each other about the longitudinal axis (1.6) of the hook. Engagement elements, comprising projections and beading, secure the hook and support either in a common plane, or offset by degrees from each other.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Kleiderbügel mit einem Tragelement (2) zur Aufnahme eines Kleidungsstückes; mit einem Haken (1), der einen gekrümmten Bereich zum Umfassen einer Stange (3) sowie einen geradlinigen Teil zum Fixieren am Tragelement (2) aufweist; der gekrümmte Bereich weist eine Auflagefläche auf, die sich in Richtung der Stangen-Längsachse erstreckt. Gemäß der Erfindung wird folgendes vorgesehen: Tragelement (2) und Haken (1) sind relativ zueinander um die Längsachse des Hakens (1) verdrehbar; es sind Eingriffselement vorgesehen, umfassend Vorsprünge und Sicken, mit denen Haken (1) und Tragelement (2) in ein- und derselben Ebene oder um 90 Grad hierzu versetzt arretierbar sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47G 25/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60N 3/00 (2006.01); A47G 25/18 (2006.01); A47G 25/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47G 25/183 (2013.01); A47G 25/32 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1044641 A2 20001018; EP 1044641 A3 20010221; DE 19916466 A1 20001019; JP 2000308563 A 20001107

INPADOC legal status


2002-07-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010822

2002-02-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 47G 25/32 A, 7A 47G 25/18 B

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI