Global Patent Index - EP 1044641 A3

EP 1044641 A3 2001-02-21 - Clothing hanger

Title (en)

Clothing hanger

Title (de)

Kleiderbügel

Title (fr)

Cintre pour vêtements

Publication

EP 1044641 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00106918 A

Priority

DE 19916466 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1044641A2] The clothes hanger has a support element (2) for a jacket, or other item of clothing, and a hook (1), which has a curved or cropped area, to surround a rod (3) and a straight part to fix to the support element. The curved area has a supporting surface extending longitudinally along the rod, to clamp or wedge it onto the rod. The support element and hook can be rotated with resp to each other about the longitudinal axis (1.6) of the hook. Engagement elements, comprising projections and beading, secure the hook and support either in a common plane, or offset by degrees from each other.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47G 25/32; A47G 25/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60N 3/00 (2006.01); A47G 25/18 (2006.01); A47G 25/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47G 25/183 (2013.01); A47G 25/32 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1044641 A2 20001018; EP 1044641 A3 20010221; DE 19916466 A1 20001019; JP 2000308563 A 20001107

INPADOC legal status


2002-07-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010822

2002-02-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 47G 25/32 A, 7A 47G 25/18 B

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI