Global Patent Index - EP 1044643 A1

EP 1044643 A1 2000-10-18 - Distributing device for paper tissues

Title (en)

Distributing device for paper tissues

Title (de)

Papierhandtücherspendervorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif distributeur de mouchoirs en papier

Publication

EP 1044643 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00201187 A

Priority

BE 9900249 A

Abstract (en)

Distributing device for distributing paper tissues, in particular small towels, which device is equipped with a container (2) which is provided with an opening (20) for the tissues at the bottom, characterised in that at least the front wall (7) of the container (2) is at least locally transparent and is provided with securing means (15) on the inside so as to secure a leaf (17) in a removable manner and opposite a transparent part of said front wall (7). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 10/38; G09F 23/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 10/38 (2006.01); G09F 23/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 23/00 (2013.01); A47K 10/3827 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1044643 A1 20001018; BE 1012606 A3 20010109

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050319

2004-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040203

2003-06-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VEECKMAN, ANDRE

2003-06-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: VEECKMAN, ANDRE

2001-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010329

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI