Global patent index - EP 1044644 A2

EP 1044644 A2 2000-10-18 - Vacuum cleaner with carrying-strap attachable to cleaner body

Title (en)

Vacuum cleaner with carrying-strap attachable to cleaner body

Title (de)

Staubsauger mit einem an dessen Gehäuse befestigbaren Tragegurt

Title (fr)

Aspirateur avec bandoulière attachable

Publication

EP 1044644 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00107555 A

Priority

DE 19916317 A

Abstract (en)

The vacuum cleaner body (1) has a rebated (5) semi- circular ring (3) into which the grip (7) is retained by projections (11 the ends of arms (9), providing a carrying handle (14). A rib (6) circumferentially locates the handle which may be released by pressing in pads (15).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Staubsauger mit einem an dessen Gehäuse befestigbaren Tragegurt, an dessen beiden freien Enden jeweils ein erstes Ankoppelelement (7) angeordnet ist, welche ersten Ankoppelelemente (7) mit an gegenüberliegenden Seiten des Staubsaugergehäuses (1) vorgesehenen Gegenkoppeletementen (3) mittels Rastverbindung (11;16) koppelbar sind. Die für die Ankoppelung des Tragegurtes notwendigen Elemente können dadurch einfacher hergestellt werden, daß die Gegenkoppelelemente (3) frei zugänglich an der Außenseite des Staubsaugergehäuses (1) angeordnet sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 5/36; A47L 9/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 5/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 5/36 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1044644 A2 20001018; EP 1044644 A3 20020814; EP 1044644 B1 20050406; DE 19916317 A1 20001019

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160430

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 50009956

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20150402

2006-03-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060110

2005-11-02 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20050406

2005-05-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50009956

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-05-12

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-05-04 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-04-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2005-04-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-04-06 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050406

2004-01-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-10-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030825

2003-05-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2003-04-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030214

2002-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI