Global Patent Index - EP 1044690 A1

EP 1044690 A1 2000-10-18 - Applications of gamma globulin-rich plasma protein mixtures of animal origin and process for the preparation thereof

Title (en)

Applications of gamma globulin-rich plasma protein mixtures of animal origin and process for the preparation thereof

Title (de)

Anwendung und Herstellungsverfahren von tierischen Gammaglobulin-reichen Plasmaprotein Mischungen

Title (fr)

Utilisation et procédé de préparation de mélanges de protéines plasmatiques d'origine animale riches en gamma-globulines

Publication

EP 1044690 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00500066 A

Priority

  • ES 9900757 A
  • ES 200000933 A

Abstract (en)

The invention concerns applications of mixtures of gamma globulin-rich plasma proteins of animal origin for the preparation of medicinal compositions, food and dietary preparations: ÄaÜ suitable for the prevention and treatment of gastrointestinal disorders in human beings and animals; ÄbÜ suitable for improving the immunological state of human beings and animals; ÄcÜ suitable for the treatment of malabsorption processes in human beings and animals, and ÄdÜ suitable for the treatment of clinical conditions accompanied by malnutrition in human beings and animals and a process for the preparation of the above mixtures comprising diluting a first gamma globulin concentrate in water at a ratio of 1:7 - 1:11; adjusting the pH to 3-6; adding polyethylene glycol at a rate of 2-6 wt%; centrifuging at an acceleration of 3000-11000 g to give a first clarified gamma globulin-rich fraction, which is separated; adjusting the pH thereof to 6-9, adding of a further amount of polyethylene glycol at a rate of 6-12 wt%; centrifuging for a second time at an acceleration of 3000-11000 g to give a second insolubilized fraction, comprising mainly gamma globulin and a second clarified fraction, which are separated.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 39/395; A61K 35/16; A61P 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 16/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 16/065 (2013.01); A61K 2039/505 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XY] EP 0064210 A1 19821110 - CUTTER LAB [US]
  • [XY] US 5531989 A 19960702 - PAUL STEPHEN M [US]
  • [Y] EP 0338229 A1 19891025 - BIOTEST PHARMA GMBH [DE]
  • [Y] SU 1754113 A1 19920815 - MO NII EPIDEMIOLOGII MIKROBIOL [SU], et al
  • [XY] HASKO F. ET AL.: "Fractionation of plasma proteins with PEG.", HAEMATOLOGICA, vol. 14, no. 2, 1981, Budapest, pages 199 - 206, XP000917117
  • [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 013, no. 169 (C - 587) 21 April 1989 (1989-04-21)
  • [XY] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 013, no. 556 (C - 664) 11 December 1989 (1989-12-11)
  • [Y] BPI, VFA, BAH, VAP: "Rote Liste 1999", 1999, ECV, AULENDORF, XP002144418
  • [Y] TRUSOVA L. ET AL.: "Fractionation of blood serum proteins by non-ionic water-soluble polymers.", VSES. GOS. NAUCHNO-KONTROL'N. INST. VET. PREP., 1980, pages 98 - 101, XP002144417

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1044690 A1 20001018; EP 1044690 B1 20050803; AT 300956 T 20050815; DE 60021644 D1 20050908; ES 2243223 T3 20051201

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160914

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050803

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050803

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060412

2007-01-10 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2006-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060412

2006-09-29 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2006-09-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060929

2006-07-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060504

2006-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-04-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060412

2006-04-12 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060412

2006-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-02-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2006-01-03 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060103

2005-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2243223 T3

2005-11-04 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051104

2005-11-03 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051103

2005-11-03 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051103

2005-11-03 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051103

2005-09-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60021644 P 20050908

2005-09-07 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2005-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-08-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-08-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-08-03 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050803

2005-08-03 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050803

2005-08-03 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050803

2005-08-03 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050803

2005-08-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050803

2005-08-03 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050803

2005-08-03 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050803

2005-03-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 39/395 A

2005-03-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 35/16 B

2005-03-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 1/00 B

2005-01-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 39/395 A

2005-01-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 16/06 B

2005-01-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 35/16 B

2005-01-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 1/00 B

2005-01-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 39/395 A

2005-01-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 16/06 B

2005-01-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 35/16 B

2001-10-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010829

2001-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010305

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI