Global Patent Index - EP 1044703 A2

EP 1044703 A2 2000-10-18 - Flame trap

Title (en)

Flame trap

Title (de)

Flammensperre

Title (fr)

Dispositif pare-flamme

Publication

EP 1044703 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00890103 A

Priority

AT 66399 A

Abstract (en)

The flame-arrester consists of flat metal strips (6,6')spaced apart by a preset amount by means of bulges (8) in at least ev second metal strip.. The sheet metal strips are parallel with the plane including the axis of the gas-through-flow opening. Seve packs of metal strips are combined in a frame (7). On at least one side of at least one pack of metal strips is at least one fur passage-wall (10) for altering the flow characteristics.

Abstract (de)

Eine Flammensperre für Gasdurchtrittsöffnungen, insbesondere als Rohr-und Detonationssicherung und zur Endsicherung von Behältern, besteht aus in vorgegebenem Abstand zueinander angeordneten ebenen Blechstreifen (6). Um bei einfacher Fertigung und einfachem Zusammenbau eine trotz großer mechanischer Festigkeit äußerst geringe Behinderung der Durchströmung durch das brennbare Gas und eine aufgrund der sicher definierten Spaltbreite verläßliche Absperrung gegen das Durchschlagen der Flammen zu gewährleisten, werden die übereinanderliegenden, im wesentlichen ebenen, geraden und parallel zur Achse der Durchtrittsöffnung (2) orientierten Blechstreifen (6) lediglich durch Ausbuchtungen (8) zumindest jedes zweiten (6') der Blechstreifen selbst im vorbestimmten Abstand gehalten, welcher der vorgeschriebenen Spaltbreite für das jeweilige Gas entspricht, und ist der Zwischenraum zwischen den Blechstreifen (6) zumindest im Bereich der Durchtrittsöffnung (2) frei von anderen Bauteilen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62C 4/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23K 5/00 (2006.01); A62C 4/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62C 4/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1044703 A2 20001018; EP 1044703 A3 20010919; AT 408839 B 20020325; AT A66399 A 20010815; CN 1141995 C 20040317; CN 1270070 A 20001018; JP 2000329331 A 20001130

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20060104

2004-05-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HOERBIGER KOMPRESSORTECHNIK HOLDING GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-06-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020208

2001-09-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-07-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HOERBIGER KOMPRESSORTECHNIK SERVICES GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HOERBIGER VENTILWERKE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI