Global Patent Index - EP 1044705 A1

EP 1044705 A1 2000-10-18 - Foot for trampolines

Title (en)

Foot for trampolines

Title (de)

Fuss für Trampoline

Title (fr)

Pied pour trampolines

Publication

EP 1044705 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00107924 A

Priority

DE 19916766 A

Abstract (en)

The trampoline (2) foot (1) is detachably fixed on the frame (8). The foot consists of at least one clamp (16) composed of a base-support (18), stays (19), connecting links (11-14) and tensioning element (10) consisting of a screw. The foot can be lower onto the base support. The trampoline can be folded up.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen speziellen Fuß zur Verwendung für Trampoline, bei denen mindestens ein Fuß (1) an deren Rahmen (8) lösbar, schwenkbar oder fest angeordnet ist, wobei der Fuß (1) aus mindestens einer Spannvorrichtung (16; 16') besteht, die aus den Elementen Grundträger (18), Strebe (19; 19'), Gelenke (11, 12, 13, 14; 11', 12', 13', 14') und Spannelement (10; 10') zusammengesetzt, also der Fuß mit einer integrierten Spannvorrichtung versehen ist. In spezieller Ausführung können Rahmenteile (8'; 8''; 8''') des Rahmens (8) Bestandteil des Fußes (1) sein; der Rahmen (8) ist bei dieser Ausführung auf einen Grundträger (18) absenkbar, zudem kann mindestens eines der besagten Teile - Rahmenstirnteil (8'), Rahmenseitenteil (8''; 8''') - in Spannrichtung (20) nachgiebig gestaltet sein, wobei mindestens ein Rahmenstirnteil (8') und ein Rahmenseitenteil (8'' bzw. 8''') mittels gleitender Einzapfungen (21; 21') miteinander verbunden sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63B 5/11

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63B 5/11 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63B 5/11 (2013.01); A63B 21/023 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1044705 A1 20001018; EP 1044705 B1 20040616; DE 10018865 A1 20001109

INPADOC legal status


2012-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101103

2011-01-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101230

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090320

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090414

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050414

2005-06-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050317

2005-04-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050414

2005-03-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-09-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040805

2004-07-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50006786 P 20040722

2004-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-06-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-06-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040616

2003-05-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030411

2001-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010323

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI