Global Patent Index - EP 1044710 A2

EP 1044710 A2 2000-10-18 - Device for remodelling a toy construction element

Title (en)

Device for remodelling a toy construction element

Title (de)

Formgebungsvorrichtung zum Umformen eines Spielbausteins

Title (fr)

Dispositif permettant de remodeler un bloc de jeu de construction

Publication

EP 1044710 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00103841 A

Priority

DE 19916736 A

Abstract (en)

The shaping appliance (10,12) is in two or more parts assembled together so that the interior of the shaping piece is cube-shaped. Two opposite-facing surfaces (15,24) of the shaping-interior are convexly curved. An insertion-sloping part (18,26) next to the surfaces around the shaping interior.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine zweiteilige Formgebungsvorrichtung (10, 12) zum Umformen eines aus einem festen Schaum bestehenden, plastisch verformbaren, im wesentlichen zylindrischen Spielbausteins (28) zu einem im wesentlichen quaderförmigen Spielbaustein (28). Ein Innenraum (Formgebungsraum) der Formgebungsvorrichtung (10, 12) weist ein kleineres Volumen als der Spielbaustein (28) auf, so daß der Spielbaustein (28) beim Zusammensetzen der Formgebungsvorrichtung (10, 12) durch Druckkräfte umgeformt wird. Durch eine konvexe Wölbung von Begrenzungsflächen des Formgebungsraums wird ein Rückstellvermögen des Spielbausteins (28) kompensiert. Einlegeschrägen (18, 26) erleichtern das Einlegen des Spielbausteins (28). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63H 33/04; A63H 33/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63H 33/00 (2006.01); A63H 33/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63H 33/001 (2013.01); A63H 33/04 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19749493 A1 19990304 - FISCHER ARTUR PROF DR H C DR I [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1044710 A2 20001018; EP 1044710 A3 20030502; EP 1044710 B1 20050209; AT 288784 T 20050215; DE 19916736 A1 20001019

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170216

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170216

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170217

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170217

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170217

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161122

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050709

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: ARTUR FISCHER TIP G.M.B.H. & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20050228

2006-06-30 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2006-05-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: FISCHERTECHNIK GMBH

- Effective date: 20060208

2006-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2006-02-28 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: FISCHERTECHNIK GMBH

- Free text: ARTUR FISCHER TIP GMBH & CO. KG#WEINHALDE 34#72178 WALDACHTAL (DE) -TRANSFER TO- FISCHERTECHNIK GMBH#WEINHALDE 14-18#72178 WALDACHTAL (DE)

2006-02-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051110

2005-11-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-09-21 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: ARTUR FISCHER TIP G.M.B.H. & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-06-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050523

2005-05-09 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050509

2005-05-09 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050509

2005-05-09 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050509

2005-03-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50009448 P 20050317

2005-03-15 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2005-03-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2005-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-28 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-24 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050224

2005-02-24 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050224

2005-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-02-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-02-09 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050209

2005-02-09 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050209

2005-02-09 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050209

2004-01-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031121

2003-11-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030909

2003-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-04-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 63H 33/04 A

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI