Global patent index - EP 1044724 A2

EP 1044724 A2 2000-10-18 - Method and apparatus for spraying workpieces

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for spraying workpieces

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Besprühen von Werkstücken

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de pulvérisation sur des objets

Publication

EP 1044724 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00107244 A

Priority

DE 19916761 A

Abstract (en)

The spraying method has a spray head (58) supplied with a liquid flow at a controlled temperature and/or pressure, for provi a liquid mist for coating the workpiece surface. The liquid flow is passed through a heat exchanger (16), supplied with hot wate for heating it to the required spray temperature, the flow to the spray head controlled by the ratio between the opening and clo intervals of a control valve. An Independent claim for a workpiece spraying device is also included.

Abstract (de)

Es wird vorgeschlagen, zum Einstellen der Abgabemengen von Sprühköpfen (58), mit denen Schmiermittel auf Oberflächenbereiche von Blechen (10) aufgesprüht wird, eine Temperaturregelung für das Schmiermittel vorzusehen und über die Temperatureinstellung die Schmiermittelabgabe durch die Sprühköpfe (58) zu regeln. Die Temperatureinstellung des Schmiermittels erfolgt unter Verwendung eines von Heizwasser durchströmten Wärmetauschers (16). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 7/16; B05B 13/02; B21B 45/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 7/16 (2006.01); B05B 7/08 (2006.01); B05B 13/02 (2006.01); B21B 45/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 7/1673 (2013.01); B05B 7/0884 (2013.01); B05B 7/1606 (2013.01); B05B 13/0207 (2013.01); B05B 13/0221 (2013.01); B05B 13/0278 (2013.01); B21B 45/0233 (2013.01); B21B 45/0251 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19544016 A1 19970528 - KLASCHKA GMBH & CO [DE], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1044724 A2 20001018; EP 1044724 A3 20030604; DE 19916761 A1 20001102; US 6491756 B1 20021210

INPADOC legal status

2003-06-18 [D17D] SEARCH REPORT (DELETED)

- Ref Legal Event Code: D17D

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-04 [R18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R18D

- Effective date: 20021102

2003-05-28 [D18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (DELETED)

- Ref Legal Event Code: D18D

2003-05-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021031

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI