Global Patent Index - EP 1044726 A2

EP 1044726 A2 2000-10-18 - Method and device for applying adhesive onto a workpiece to be coated with a film

Title (en)

Method and device for applying adhesive onto a workpiece to be coated with a film

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Auftragen von Klebstoff auf ein mit einer Folie zu beschichtendes Werkstück

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif d'application d'adhésif sur une pièce à revêtir d'un film

Publication

EP 1044726 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00107229 A

Priority

DE 19917130 A

Abstract (en)

The procedure involves loading the adhesive (7) onto an elastically deformable application roller (2) which is then rolled o the surface (13) of the workpiece (1) to apply the adhesive. After rolling any remaining excess adhesive is removed from the rol by a first scraper (4). The adhesive for applying to the roller is kept in circulation and in this connection is directed throug cleaning unit (9). The adhesive is applied to the application roller by a dosing roller (3) rotating in the opposite direction t the application roller, the gap (12) between the rollers being governed by pressing-on force. An Independent claim is included for a device to carry out the propsoed procedure and which is equipped with an elastic deformable roller to apply the adhesive onto a workpiece surface, and a dosing roller to apply adhesive to the application rolle

Abstract (de)

Der Klebstoffauftrag auf ein mit einer Folie zu beschichtendes Werkstück, (1) insbesondere ein Möbelteil aus Holz oder Holzwerkstoff mit nicht ebener Oberfläche, wird durch Abrollen einer Auftragswalze (2) auf der zu beschichtenden Oberfläche des Werkstücks (1) bewerkstelligt, wobei der Klebstoff der Auftragawalze (2) aufgegeben wird und diese einen weichen, elastisch verformbaren Belag aufweist. Hierdurch ist es möglich, die Beleimung von Werkstücken (1) im Durchlaufverfahren vorzunehmen und zur Vermeidung von Spannquellungen und unerwünschten Oberflächenrauhigkeiten einen einkomponentigen Klebstoff mit geringem Wassergehalt und hohem Festkörperanteil zu verwenden. Das mit der erfindungsgemäßen Vorrichtung durchzuführende neue Verfahren führt also zu höherwertigen Endprodukten bei gleichzeitiger Einsparung bei der benötigten Klebstoffmenge. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05C 1/08; B27G 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05C 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05C 1/0865 (2013.01); B05C 1/083 (2013.01); B05C 1/0834 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 4307816 C2 19951123 - BUERKLE GMBH & CO ROBERT [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1044726 A2 20001018; EP 1044726 A3 20040204; DE 19917130 A1 20001019; PL 339694 A1 20001023

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040805

2004-12-02 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-10-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-02-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 05C 1/08 A

2004-02-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 27G 11/00 B

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI