Global Patent Index - EP 1044743 A1

EP 1044743 A1 2000-10-18 - Hot chamber die casting machine

Title (en)

Hot chamber die casting machine

Title (de)

Warmkammer-Druckgiessmaschine

Title (fr)

Machine à couler sous pression à chambre chaude

Publication

EP 1044743 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99111960 A

Priority

  • EP 99111960 A
  • EP 99106242 A

Abstract (en)

Drive units (14) are formed as linear drives driven by electrical servomotors (17). The pushing speed of the unit can be regulated. Die casting machine comprises a casting vessel arranged in a metal bath within a melt crucible and a nozzle connected to it Drive units (14) with their axes parallel to the nozzle are connected on one side to a guide arm of a machine stand connected to crucible and on the other side to a fixed mold plate (8) to which the halves of a mold are fixed. The drive units (14) are forme linear drives driven by electrical servomotors (17). The pushing speed of the unit can be regulated.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Warmkammer-Druckgießmaschine beschrieben, bei der zum Anfahren und Andrücken der Angußbüchse (30) an die Düse (29) anstelle von hydraulischen Zylindern Antriebsaggregate in der Form von elektrischen Servomotoren (17) vorgesehen sind, deren Vorschubgeschwindigkeit regelbar ist. Um hier die Wärmebeeinflussung vom Schmelztiegel (11) und vom Ofen (10) zu vermeiden, werden die Drehachsen der Servomotoren, die oberhalb von Schmelztiegel und Ofen liegen, über ein Winkelgetriebe (15) am Spindelantrieb (14) angeschlossen und etwa vertikal ausgerichtet. Durch diese Maßnahme wird es möglich, eine zeitoptimierte und feinfühlige Vorschubregelung zu erreichen, die unabhängig von den auftretenden Temperaturen ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 17/06; B22D 17/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 17/02 (2006.01); B22D 17/06 (2006.01); B22D 17/20 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

B22D (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 17/06 (2013.01); B22D 17/2015 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1044743 A1 20001018; EP 1044743 B1 20030806; AT 246561 T 20030815; CZ 20001347 A3 20010711; CZ 301964 B6 20100818; DE 59906506 D1 20030911; ES 2205643 T3 20040501; HK 1030570 A1 20031212; JP 2000301309 A 20001031; JP 2010099742 A 20100506; JP 4808833 B2 20111102; PL 193532 B1 20070228; PL 339612 A1 20001023; US 6390175 B1 20020521

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 246561

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20160624

2017-01-31 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2017-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150625

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150623

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150619

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150625

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150630

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150623

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150623

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150623

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-06-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-03-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: WAGNER PATENT AG, CH

2009-11-13 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: OSKAR FRECH GMBH & CO.

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2007-04-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ZIMMERLI, WAGNER & PARTNER AG

2004-07-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040507

2004-05-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2205643

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-12-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20031203

2003-09-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59906506

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-09-11

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-08-12 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-08-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2003-08-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001121

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI