Global patent index - EP 1044758 A2

EP 1044758 A2 2000-10-18 - Support element for the clamping of workpieces

Title (en)

Support element for the clamping of workpieces

Title (de)

Stützelement zum Spannen von Werkstücken

Title (fr)

Elément de support pour la fixation de pièces de travail

Publication

EP 1044758 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00107620 A

Priority

DE 19916260 A

Abstract (en)

The support element has a support bolt (2) guided movable in a blind bore let into the housing. The bore has over the active region in which the bolt is moved, a housing recess (21) whose width is less than the diameter of the bolt. Its edges are concav and form two contact pressure faces (19,20) of the housing. The holding piston (4) which acts perpendicular to the work directio the support bolt has a piston recess (22) smaller than the diameter of the support bolt so that two web segments are formed whos inner edges run lengthwise to the work direction of the bolt and are concave to form contact pressure faces (17 18) of the pisto

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf ein Stützelement zum Abstützen von labilen Werkstücken auf Werkzeugmaschinen, Maschinentischen und/oder Paletten. In einem Gehäuse ist ein Stützbolzen beweglich geführt und wird durch einen senkrecht dazu angeordneten Haltekolben in seiner Spannposition festgesetzt. Der Haltekolben (4) ist mit einer Aussparung (22) versehen und bildet zwei Stegsegmente (28) deren Kanten angefast die beiden Kolbenanpreßflächen (17,18) bilden. Der Stützbolzen (2) gleitet in einer Bohrung, die ebenfalls mit einer Aussparung (21) versehen ist, so daß sich zwei Kanten bilden, die angefast die Gehäuseanpreßflächen (19,20) ergeben. Zwischen diesen Anpreßflächen (17,18,19,20) ist der Stützbolzen (2) festsetzbar. Der Haltekolben (4) verbindet die beiden Stegsegmente (28) mit einem Kolbenboden (27), der elastisch verformbar ist. Der Mantel des Haltekolbens ist im Bereich der Stegsegmente partiell frei gearbeitet, so daß vier Stütznoppen (8,9,10,11) entstehen. Im Spannzustand wird infolge der Gegenkräfte ein Moment auf die Stegsegmente ausgeübt, das diese nach aussen drückt, bis ihre Stütznoppen an der Zylinderwandung fest anliegen. Der Haltekolben wird damit zum Bestandteil des Gehäuses und übernimmt die Aufrechterhaltung des Stützdruckes ohne Setzerscheinung. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B23Q 3/10; B23Q 1/76

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 5/06 (2013.01); B25B 5/061 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1044758 A2 20001018; EP 1044758 A3 20020502; DE 19916260 A1 20001026; US 6273410 B1 20010814

INPADOC legal status

2003-12-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030614

2003-01-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20021026

2002-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-05-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 23Q 3/10 A, 7B 23Q 1/76 B, 7B 25B 5/06 B

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI