Global Patent Index - EP 1044792 A3

EP 1044792 A3 2000-11-29 - Method and apparatus for compressing of single-use cans

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for compressing of single-use cans

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Komprimieren gebrauchter Einwegdosen

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la compression de boîtes à usage unique

Publication

EP 1044792 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00106680 A

Priority

DE 19914618 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1044792A2] The crusher unit consists of a receptacle in the form of a truncated cone, cylinder or hyperboloid of revolution. One side o the receptacle is open and the other closed by a sealing plate which may be flat, convex or concave. The top part of a punch is in t form of a hyperboloid of revolution. The receptacle and punch can be heated.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B30B 9/32; B21D 51/26; B29B 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B30B 9/30 (2006.01); B30B 9/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B30B 9/321 (2013.01); B30B 9/3021 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19914618 A1 20001005; EP 1044792 A2 20001018; EP 1044792 A3 20001129

INPADOC legal status


2002-12-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-09-20 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-08-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 30B 9/32 A, 7B 29B 17/00 B, 7B 21D 51/26 B

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI