Global Patent Index - EP 1044810 A1

EP 1044810 A1 2000-10-18 - Printing machine comprising an inking and a dampening device

Title (en)

Printing machine comprising an inking and a dampening device

Title (de)

Druckmaschine mit einem Farb- und einem Feuchtwerk

Title (fr)

Machine d'impression comprenant un dispositif d'encrage et de mouillage

Publication

EP 1044810 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00107284 A

Priority

DE 29906466 U

Abstract (en)

The printing mechanism has ink and moisture application rolls for a printing cylinder with printing form fixed to it and a r moving mechanism. To remove rubber from the moisturizing rolls (13, 14, 15), the moisture application roll (13) can be moved to position at a spacing from the plate cylinder (1). A bridging roll (12), in contact with the moisture application roll, can be brought against a roll of the inking mechanism. The moisture input rolls (14, 15) can be separated from the moisture application roll. There is also a washing spray (10, 11).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Druckmaschine mit einem Farb- und einem Feuchtwerk, welche mittels Farb- und Feuchtauftragwalzen mit einer auf einem Plattenzylinder fixierten Druckform zusammenwirken und mit einer Steuereinrichtung zur Verlagerung der Farb-/Feuchtwalzen in eine Anlage- bzw. Abstandsstellung zur Druckform. Aufgabe der Erfindung ist es, die Gummierung in effektiver Weise aus einem Druckwerk, zumindest einem Feuchtwerk, zu entfernen. Gelöst wird das in erster Ausbildung dadurch, indem eine Feuchtauftragwalze 13 vom Plattenzylinder 1 in eine Abstandsstellung verbringbar ist, eine mit der Feuchtauftragwalze 13 in Kontakt stehende Brückenwalze 12 mit einer Walze des Farbwerkes 4 in Anlagestellung verbringbar ist, eine Feuchtmittelzuführeinrichtung 14,15 von der Feuchtauftragwalze 13 trennbar ist und daß eine dem Farbwerk 4 zugeordnete Sprüheinrichtung 10,11 aktivierbar ist sowie eine dem Farbwerk 4 zugeordnete Rakeleinrichtung 8 mit einer Walze des Farbwerkes 4 in Anlagestellung bringbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 7/26; B41F 35/00; B41F 35/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 7/26 (2006.01); B41F 35/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 35/04 (2013.01); B41F 7/26 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 29906466 U1 19990701; EP 1044810 A1 20001018

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20101103

2008-07-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MANROLAND AG

2006-12-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061124

2001-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR GB

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000824

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI