Global Patent Index - EP 1044814 A3

EP 1044814 A3 2001-04-25 - Device for cleaning the surface of bearer rings of rotating cylinders in rotary presses

Title (en)

Device for cleaning the surface of bearer rings of rotating cylinders in rotary presses

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Reinigen der Oberfläche von Schmitzringen auf rotierenden Zylindern in Rotationsdruckmaschinen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de nettoyage de surface de cordons de cylindres rotatifs dans des machines rotatives

Publication

EP 1044814 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99120900 A

Priority

US 29146099 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1044814A2] The wiper element (12) is fixed by a clamping arrangement by means of a holder (20) and is adjustable on the surface (17) of rotary cylinder bearers (16). The clamping arrangement includes a rapid, clamping element (21,22) movably held between a first, release position in which the wiper element is movably held by the rapid closure element and a second, clamping position. The ra clamping element has two clamping jaws (21,22) rotating in an opening (24) Cleaning appliance for the surface of rotary cylinder bearings in rotary printers

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 35/00; B41F 13/21

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 35/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 35/00 (2013.01); B41P 2235/21 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1044814 A2 20001018; EP 1044814 A3 20010425; EP 1044814 B1 20020904; DE 19951893 A1 20001019; DE 59902549 D1 20021010; US 6272988 B1 20010814

INPADOC legal status


2012-08-09 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59902549

- Effective date: 20120501

2012-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120501

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101027

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-06-20 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-03-05 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902549 20021010

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-04 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-03-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020214

2002-01-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010316

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI