Global Patent Index - EP 1044817 A2

EP 1044817 A2 2000-10-18 - Ink jet printer and method for operating the same

Title (en)

Ink jet printer and method for operating the same

Title (de)

Tintenstrahldrucker und Verfahren zu seinem Betrieb

Title (fr)

Imprimante à jet d'encre et procédé de son opération

Publication

EP 1044817 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00108345 A

Priority

JP 10978999 A

Abstract (en)

An ink jet printer and a method for operating the same are proposed. In order to improve the printing quality, the paper and the ink are heated to substantially the same temperature. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/01 (2006.01); B41J 11/00 (2006.01); B41J 29/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 11/002 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1044817 A2 20001018; EP 1044817 A3 20010117; CN 1270890 A 20001025; JP 2000296607 A 20001024

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-09 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030116

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES FR GB IT

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010130

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI