Global Patent Index - EP 1044822 A1

EP 1044822 A1 2000-10-18 - Decorative base paper with ink jet ink accepting layer

Title (en)

Decorative base paper with ink jet ink accepting layer

Title (de)

Dekorrohpapier mit Ink-Jet-Tintenaufnahmeschicht

Title (fr)

Base d'une feuille décorative avec une couche qui accepte l'encre d'un appareil jet d'encre

Publication

EP 1044822 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00107212 A

Priority

DE 19916546 A

Abstract (en)

A decorative paper (I) for the decorative coating of materials, contains an ink absorbent layer.

Abstract (de)

Ein Dekorrohpapier oder ein vorimprägniertes Dekorrohpapier ist zur Bedruckung nach dem Ink-Jet-Verfahren mit einer Tintenabsorptionsschicht ausgerüstet.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 5/00; D21H 27/26; B44C 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/01 (2006.01); B41M 1/26 (2006.01); B41M 1/36 (2006.01); B41M 5/00 (2006.01); B41M 5/50 (2006.01); B41M 5/52 (2006.01); B44C 5/04 (2006.01); D21H 19/24 (2006.01); D21H 27/00 (2006.01); D21H 27/26 (2006.01); B41M 3/18 (2006.01); D21H 11/04 (2006.01); D21H 17/51 (2006.01); D21H 17/54 (2006.01); D21H 17/67 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/52 (2013.01); B44C 5/0446 (2013.01); D21H 27/26 (2013.01); B41M 3/18 (2013.01); B41M 5/508 (2013.01); B41M 5/5218 (2013.01); B41M 5/5254 (2013.01); D21H 11/04 (2013.01); D21H 17/51 (2013.01); D21H 17/54 (2013.01); D21H 17/675 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24802 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24901 (2013.01); Y10T 428/269 (2013.01); Y10T 428/31862 (2015.04); Y10T 428/31873 (2015.04); Y10T 428/31877 (2015.04); Y10T 428/31895 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1044822 A1 20001018; EP 1044822 B1 20040908; AT 275480 T 20040915; BR 0001579 A 20001031; BR 0001579 B1 20120918; CA 2303644 A1 20001013; CA 2303644 C 20090224; CN 100338307 C 20070919; CN 1270255 A 20001018; DE 19916546 A1 20001026; DE 19916546 C2 20010503; DE 50007653 D1 20041014; ES 2226630 T3 20050401; JP 2000335105 A 20001205; JP 2007211390 A 20070823; PL 193774 B1 20070330; PL 339613 A1 20001023; PT 1044822 E 20041231; US 2003039810 A1 20030227; US 6706372 B2 20040316

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161003

2017-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160501

2017-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160401

2017-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160430

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160401

2017-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160430

2016-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160401

2016-12-07 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160501

2016-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160427

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160420

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160420

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160413

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150420

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-07-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20150401

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-07-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20150413

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150420

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150420

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-05-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SCHOELLER TECHNOCELL GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: TECHNOCELL DEKOR GMBH & CO. KG, 49086 OSNABRUECK, DE

- Document: DE 50007653

- Effective date: 20120328

2012-05-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50007653

- Representative's name: COHAUSZ & FLORACK PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE P, DE

- Effective date: 20120328

2012-03-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50007653

- Representative's name: COHAUSZ & FLORACK PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE P, DE

2005-08-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050609

2005-05-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2226630 T3

2004-12-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20041014

2004-12-28 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-10-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2004-10-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50007653 P 20041014

2004-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2004-09-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-04-28 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2003-06-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030428

2001-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2001-07-04 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20010328

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010328

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI