Global Patent Index - EP 1044825 A1

EP 1044825 A1 2000-10-18 - Sheet dispenser with optional support or attachment means

Title (en)

Sheet dispenser with optional support or attachment means

Title (de)

Blattspender mit wahlweisern Stütz- oder befestigungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Distributeur de feuilles à support ou éléments de fixation optionnels

Publication

EP 1044825 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99123228 A

Priority

  • EP 94914720 A
  • US 6440393 A
  • US 6351993 A

Abstract (en)

A dispenser (20) for flexible sheets (11) from a stack (10) of adhesive coated sheets disposed one on top of another. The dispenser (20) comprises a first housing portion (35) including a bottom wall (23), end walls (26), side walls (33) and a first top wall portion (28); and a second housing portion (36) comprising a second top wall portion (29) mounted on the first housing portion (35) for movement between a normal position where the top wall portions (28 and 29) define an outlet opening for the sheets (11) between adjacent ends, and an open position with the second top wall portion (29) spaced from the first top wall portion (28) to afford inserting a stack (10) of sheets (11) into the cavity (22). The dispenser (20) includes attaching means adapted for releasably attaching the dispenser to several retaining means including a strap (54) by which the dispenser (20) can be secured on a user's hand or wrist; a support member (61) adapted to be held between user's fingers; a weighted base (78); or a base (80) adapted to be attached to a surface by various means such as adhesive, suction cups or magnetic material. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B42D 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 10/24 (2006.01); B42D 5/00 (2006.01); B65C 11/00 (2006.01); B65D 25/52 (2006.01); B65D 83/08 (2006.01); B65H 1/00 (2006.01); B65H 1/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 1/00 (2013.01); B42D 5/005 (2013.01); B65C 11/00 (2013.01); B65D 83/0894 (2013.01); B65H 2402/41 (2013.01); B65H 2402/411 (2013.01); B65H 2701/1934 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9426158 A1 19941124; CA 2161420 A1 19941124; DE 69424804 D1 20000706; DE 69424804 T2 20010111; DE 69433187 D1 20031030; DE 69433187 T2 20040609; DE 69435037 D1 20071129; DE 69435037 T2 20080724; EP 0746223 A1 19961211; EP 0746223 A4 19960920; EP 0746223 B1 20000531; EP 1044825 A1 20001018; EP 1044825 B1 20030924; EP 1378374 A2 20040107; EP 1378374 A3 20040114; EP 1378374 B1 20071017; JP 2004315236 A 20041111; JP 2006315765 A 20061124; JP 3622968 B2 20050223; JP 3828121 B2 20061004; JP H08510147 A 19961029

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080321

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080321

2007-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070430

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-03-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070327

- Year of fee payment: 14

2004-09-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040625

2003-10-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69433187 P 20031030

2003-09-24 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0746223 P

2003-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2003-09-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-12-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011019

2001-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010309

2000-10-18 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 746223

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB