Global Patent Index - EP 1044896 A1

EP 1044896 A1 2000-10-18 - Valve actuator, pressurised container comprising such an actuator and process for charging the container with propellant

Title (en)

Valve actuator, pressurised container comprising such an actuator and process for charging the container with propellant

Title (de)

Ventilbetätigungsknopf, mit diesem Knopf versehener Druckbehälter und Verfahren zum Befüllen dieses Behälters mit Treibmittel

Title (fr)

Bouton de commande pour valve, récipient pressurisé comportant un tel bouton et procédé pour remplir ce récipient d'un gaz propulseur

Publication

EP 1044896 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00302822 A

Priority

  • US 29247399 A
  • US 29247499 A

Abstract (en)

An actuator (38) for facilitating filling of an aerosol contain by a button-on-filling process, the actuator comprising an exterior housing (83) having an outer wall with a product discharge outlet (40) formed therein. The exterior housing (83) further having central post (87) supporting an internal bore which establishes fluid communication between a product inlet (85) and the product discharge outlet (40) to facilitate dispensing an aerosol product via the actuator. At least two spaced apart reinforcement ribs (76) are provided for interconnecting the exterior housing (83) with the central post (87) and thereby define at least two compartments (73) where any remaining filling component may collect. A base of the exterior housing has an annular skirt portion (75) which facilitates sealing engagement with a pedestal portion of a mounting cup (10) during a filling operation. A longitudinal passageway (70) communicates with each formed compartment (73), of the actuator, to facilitate complete purging of any remaning filling component, during a purging step of the button-on-filling process, tom each formed compartment (73) to essentially prevent the discharge of any remaining filling component into a surrounding production facility environment. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 83/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/425 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1044896 A1 20001018

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021230

2002-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020619

2001-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010103

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI