Global Patent Index - EP 1044897 A1

EP 1044897 A1 2000-10-18 - Package for confectionary

Title (en)

Package for confectionary

Title (de)

Verpackung für Konfekt

Title (fr)

Emballage pour confiserie

Publication

EP 1044897 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00107745 A

Priority

DE 19916687 A

Abstract (en)

The packaging consists of a base section (1) and a lid section. The base section has a shape corresponding to the lower part the chocolates, while the lid section has a shape corresponding to the upper part of the chocolates. The two sections are joined together at their side walls to form a single packaging unit for the chocolates.

Abstract (de)

Eine Verpackung für Konfekt, insbesondere Pralinen umfaßt einen Bodenteil (1) und einen Deckelteil (3), wobei der Bodenteil eine untere Formhälfte (2) mit der Außenkontur des Konfekts entsprechenden Vertiefungen (2c) und der Deckelteil (3) eine obere Formhälfte (4) mit der Außenkontur des Konfekts entsprechenden Vertiefungen (4c) aufweist, die nach Art einer Gußform entsprechend der Außenkontur des Konfekts (6) ausgebildet sind, so daß die innere Umhüllung den Konfekt (6) eng anliegend umschließt. Somit ist ein optimaler Schutz des Konfekts, insbesondere vor Druckstellen, gewährleistet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 85/60; B65D 5/20; B65D 5/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/20 (2006.01); B65D 5/50 (2006.01); B65D 85/60 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/2004 (2013.01); B65D 5/503 (2013.01); B65D 85/60 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

GB 2199015 A 19880629 - CADBURY LTD

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29908797 U1 19991125; DE 19916687 A1 20001026; EP 1044897 A1 20001018

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030402

2003-01-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021121

2001-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001211

2000-11-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: VERDOODT, DIRK

2000-11-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: EBERHARDT, STEFAN

2000-11-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DONDORF, UTE

2000-11-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHARTMANN, BERND, DR.

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI